Global Patent Index - EP 0979691 A1

EP 0979691 A1 2000-02-16 - Punching machine with a device for lubricating the punching region

Title (en)

Punching machine with a device for lubricating the punching region

Title (de)

Stanze mit einer Vorrichtung zum Schmieren des Stanzbereiches

Title (fr)

Poinçonneuse avec dispositif pour lubrifier la region de poinçonnage

Publication

EP 0979691 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830307 A

Priority

EP 98830307 A

Abstract (en)

A punching machine (100) having: at least one punchholder (2) in turn having a channel (14a, 10, 8a, 4a, 4b) for feeding a lubricant/compressed air mixture to a punching region (ZP) on a metal sheet (34); piping means (51) for connecting the channel (14a, 10, 8a, 4a, 4b) to a source (50) of atomized lubricant; and on/off valve means (52) for selectively permitting or preventing supply of the atomized lubricant to the piping means (51) and the channel (14a, 10, 8a, 4a, 4b); the valve means (52) being controlled, via a device (41), by the position in space of an element (2), which position in space is detected by means of a probe (36); and the punching machine (100) being characterized in that the probe (36) detects the vertical position of the punchholder (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 37/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 37/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 37/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979691 A1 20000216; EP 0979691 B1 20020213; DE 69803846 D1 20020321

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130520

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120530

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021114

2003-01-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020520

2002-05-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020520

2002-05-14 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020514

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69803846

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-21

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000222

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990729

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI