Global Patent Index - EP 0979697 A1

EP 0979697 A1 2000-02-16 - A process and system for manufacturing cast articles provided with inserts

Title (en)

A process and system for manufacturing cast articles provided with inserts

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zur Herstellung eines Gussteils, versehen mit einem Insert

Title (fr)

Procédé et système pour la fabrication d'un pièce de coulée équipé d'un insert

Publication

EP 0979697 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830495 A

Priority

EP 98830495 A

Abstract (en)

During the production of castings incorporating inserts such as, for example, internal-combustion-engine blocks incorporating cylinder liners (C) as inserts, there is provision for the inserts (C) to be subjected to a pre-heating step (12) prior to insertion in the casting cavity. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 19/00; B22D 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 19/00 (2006.01); B22D 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 19/00 (2013.01); B22D 47/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4738298 A 19880419 - TARUNO YASUNORI [JP], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 523 (M - 1049) 16 November 1990 (1990-11-16)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 045 (M - 667) 10 February 1988 (1988-02-10)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 381 (M - 1162) 26 September 1991 (1991-09-26)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 083 (M - 1216) 28 February 1992 (1992-02-28)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 365 (M - 1442) 9 July 1993 (1993-07-09)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979697 A1 20000216; MX PA99007388 A 20050110

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020610

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI