Global Patent Index - EP 0979713 A2

EP 0979713 A2 2000-02-16 - Flexible process and plant for making concrete railway sleepers

Title (en)

Flexible process and plant for making concrete railway sleepers

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur variablen Fertigung von Betonschwellen

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation flexibles pour la fabrication de traverses de chemin de fer en béton

Publication

EP 0979713 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99110373 A

Priority

DE 19836320 A

Abstract (en)

The sleeper production process involves cleaning the molds at a preparation point (1) and fitting the with armature if required before filling them at a concreting and shaking-down point (2). The sleepers are set by a heat treatment process. The sleepers are made in multiple molds and the heat treatment is in heat chambers (16-29).

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur variablen Fertigung von Betonschwellen mit oder ohne Spannarmierung, bei dem die Formen in einer Vorbereitungsstation (1) gereinigt und mit den Armierungen versehen werden, um anschließend in einer Betonier- und Rüttelstation (2) mit Beton gefüllt zu werden, und die Schwellen durch eine Wärmebehandlung ausgehärtet werden, wobei alle Schwellen in Mehrfachformen, vorzugsweise in ihren Abmessungen gleichen Vierfachformen, gefertigt werden und die Wärmebehandlung in Wärmekammern (16-29) erfolgt, die mit den ausbetonierten Formen über ein Regalbediengerät beschickt und entleert werden, das die Formen einer Entspann- und Entleerstation (32) vor einer Vorbereitungsstation (1) zuleitet, sowie eine Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 15/00; B28B 7/24; B28B 11/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 15/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979713 A2 20000216; EP 0979713 A3 20011017; EP 0979713 B1 20030709; AT 244627 T 20030715; BR 9903580 A 20010320; DE 19836320 A1 20000224; DE 19836320 C2 20020620; ES 2197544 T3 20040101; PT 979713 E 20031128; TW 420630 B 20010201; US 6383420 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-03-31 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20041202

2005-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041201

2005-01-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20040528

2005-01-05 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20041019

2005-01-05 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20041019

2004-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: LEONHARD MOLL BETONWERKE GMBH & CO. KG

2004-05-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: LEONHARD MOLL BETONWERKE GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2197544 T3

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031025

2003-11-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403945

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV RO SI

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021018

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

2002-07-03 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20020220;LT PAYMENT 20020220;LV PAYMENT 20020220;RO PAYMENT 20020220;SI PAYMENT 20020220

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020220

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI