Global Patent Index - EP 0979731 A1

EP 0979731 A1 2000-02-16 - Printing device with rotary supports

Title (en)

Printing device with rotary supports

Title (de)

Druckmaschine mit rotierendem Halter für Gegenstände

Title (fr)

Machine à imprimer à supports porte-objet montés rotatifs

Publication

EP 0979731 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402041 A

Priority

FR 9810377 A

Abstract (en)

The printing machine, comprising printing stations (22A) and processing stations (22B) e.g. for drying, varnishing, bleaching or dusting, has separate controls (31A, 31B) for the printing station rotary drives (30A) and the processing station rotary drives (30B). The controls are in the form of numerical control motors connected by belts to a number of pulleys.

Abstract (fr)

Il s'agit d'une machine dans laquelle interviennent, à des postes d'impression (22A), d'une part, et à des postes de traitement (22B), d'autre part, pour l'entraînement en rotation de supports porte-objet (17), des blocs d'entraînement en rotation (30A, 30B). Suivant l'invention, les moyens de commande (31A) des blocs d'entraînement en rotation (30A) correspondant aux postes d'impression (22A) sont distincts des moyens de commande (31B) des blocs d'entraînement en rotation (30B) correspondant aux postes de traitement (22B). Application, notamment, à l'impression de tubes souples en plusieurs couleurs. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 17/10 (2006.01); B41F 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/0872 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 3253538 A 19660531 - RUDOLPH ROME R, et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979731 A1 20000216; EP 0979731 B1 20021106; DE 69903773 D1 20021212; DE 69903773 T2 20030821; ES 2186312 T3 20030501; FR 2782292 A1 20000218; FR 2782292 B1 20001110; JP 2000062141 A 20000229; JP 4435337 B2 20100317; US 6164199 A 20001226

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080812

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080811

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080812

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080811

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050719

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070810

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070824

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070809

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060728

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2186312

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69903773

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-12

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LES MACHINES DUBUIT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010802

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI