Global Patent Index - EP 0979738 A1

EP 0979738 A1 2000-02-16 - Surface treatment method and apparatus for graining aluminium base for printing plates

Title (en)

Surface treatment method and apparatus for graining aluminium base for printing plates

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung eines Aluminiumträgers für Flachdruckplatten

Title (fr)

Appareil et procédé de traitement d'un support en aluminium pour plaques lithographiques

Publication

EP 0979738 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99306265 A

Priority

JP 22902598 A

Abstract (en)

A surface treatment method and apparatus for graining a surface of an aluminum plate as a base of a printing plate, wherein graining brushes are pressed onto the aluminum plate and are turned to brush the aluminum plate to rub abrasive slurry on the aluminum plate surface. The amount of electric power required for driving the graining brush to turn at a constant speed to brush the aluminum plate is monitored and maintained constant by changing pressing amount of the graining brush onto the aluminum plate. A classifier continually takes in a part of the abrasive slurry from a slurry supply tank, classifies abrasive particles in the abrasive slurry according to their particle diameters, and feeds back those abrasive particles with larger diameters than a predetermined particle diameter to the slurry supply tank. Those abrasive particles with smaller diameters than the predetermined particle diameter are excluded from the abrasive slurry, so the particle diameters of the abrasive materials in the abrasive slurry are maintained in a predetermined range. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41N 1/08 (2006.01); B24B 29/00 (2006.01); B41N 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979738 A1 20000216; EP 0979738 B1 20021113; JP 2000062341 A 20000229

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130806

2014-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130806

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120801

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030814

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-05-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020313

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: GB

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI