Global Patent Index - EP 0979739 A3

EP 0979739 A3 2000-03-15 - Method for making books from a pack of signatures sewn together

Title (en)

Method for making books from a pack of signatures sewn together

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Büchern aus einem Stapel zusammengenähter Druckbogen

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la fabrication de livres à partir d'une pile de cahiers cousus ensemble

Publication

EP 0979739 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98204436 A

Priority

IT MI981878 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0979739A2] A method for making books from a pack (3) of signatures (4) sewn together, with the sewing thread (f) interrupted after each group (5) of signatures (4) that make up a book, includes the step of applying to each group (5) of signatures (4) at least one length (13) of adhesive tape embracing the signatures (4) of the group (5). The method achieves the advantage of ensuring that the last signature (4) of the group (5) cannot be lost, that is to say the advantage of ensuring the integrity and tightness of the complete group (5) containing all its signatures (4), in an unusually simple and reliable manner. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42C 9/0075 (2013.01); B42B 2/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979739 A2 20000216; EP 0979739 A3 20000315; IT 1301916 B1 20000707; IT MI981878 A1 20000210; IT MI981878 D0 19980810

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030514

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE IT LI

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI