Global patent index - EP 0979782 A1

EP 0979782 A1 2000-02-16 - Multi-compartment blow-molded plastic bottle and closure therefor

Title (en)

Multi-compartment blow-molded plastic bottle and closure therefor

Title (de)

Im Blasverfahren hergestellte Mehrkammerflasche aus Kunststoff und Verschluss für Mehrkammerflasche

Title (fr)

Bouteille plastique multi-chambre moulée par soufflage et fermeture pour cette bouteille

Publication

EP 0979782 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810765 A

Priority

EP 98810765 A

Abstract (en)

The multi-chamber bottle has e.g. two chambers (11, 13) with apertures (21, 23) inside the neck (19). One aperture (23) is co-axial with the neck. The cover unit can be screwed or pressed onto the thread (20) or snap bulge. The plug then seals the aperture (23). There are also two channels running from the chambers to outlet apertures which can be closed with the cap of the cover unit.

Abstract (de)

Die Mehrkammerflasche besitzt beispielsweise zwei Kammern (11,13) mit Oeffnungen (21,23), welche innerhalb des Stutzens (19) angeordnet sind. Die Oeffnung (23) ist koaxial zum Stutzen (19) angeordnet. Dies erlaubt das Aufschrauben oder Aufprellen eines Verschlusses (27) auf den mit Gewinde (20) oder Schnappwulst versehenen Stutzen. Dabei dringt der Ansatz (43) dichtend in die Oeffnung (23) ein. Es bestehen somit zwei Kanäle (35,37), die von den Kammern (11,13) zu den Auslassöffnungen (39,40) führen. Die Auslassöffnungen sind mit dem Deckel (42) verschliessbar. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/32; B65D 1/04; B65D 47/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/04 (2006.01); B65D 47/08 (2006.01); B65D 81/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/04 (2013.01); B65D 47/08 (2013.01); B65D 81/3227 (2013.01); B65D 81/3283 (2013.01); B65D 2251/1041 (2013.01); B65D 2251/1083 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 97810586 A 19970821

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979782 A1 20000216; EP 0979782 B1 20010711; AT 202993 T 20010715; AU 4893699 A 20000306; BR 9914305 A 20010619; BR 9914305 B1 20081118; CA 2339937 A1 20000224; CA 2339937 C 20060711; CN 1099359 C 20030122; CN 1321134 A 20011107; DE 59801007 D1 20010816; ES 2161032 T3 20011116; HU 0102891 A2 20011128; HU 0102891 A3 20020128; MX PA01001221 A 20030714; PL 197386 B1 20080331; PL 346133 A1 20020128; PT 979782 E 20011130; TR 200100423 T2 20010921; US 6550647 B1 20030422; WO 0009413 A1 20000224

INPADOC legal status

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150827

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110810

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-07-17 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: ALPLA BETEILIGUNGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20120705

2012-06-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59801007

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120301

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110810

2012-05-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20110810

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110210

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100810

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-03-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110301

2011-02-16 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110210

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100819

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100823

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100901

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100823

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090721

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090814

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090804

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2008-07-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALPLA BETEILIGUNGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2002-07-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010907

2001-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2161032

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-11-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20011016

2001-09-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2001-09-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801007

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-08-16

2001-07-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2001-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 202993

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-05-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2000-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI

2000-09-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALPLA WERKE ALWIN LEHNER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990930

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI