Global Patent Index - EP 0979791 A2

EP 0979791 A2 2000-02-16 - Cross wound bobbins producing textile machine

Title (en)

Cross wound bobbins producing textile machine

Title (de)

Kreuzspulen herstellende Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine textile fabricant des bobines croisées

Publication

EP 0979791 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99110192 A

Priority

DE 19836702 A

Abstract (en)

The machine (1) for winding cross wound bobbins has a number of winding stations, each with a bobbin drum (17) powered by a separate electromotor with computer (39) control. The memory holds data (x,y) relating to the number of groove paths at the bobbin drum (17). The computer control sets the number of bobbin drum (17) rotations on the start of winding a new bobbin, according to the drum type in use. The data (x,y) relating to the bobbin drum (17) type are stored at the central control (37) of the textile machine (1). The central control (37) is linked by a machine bus (40) with the workstation computer (39) and also the control unit (38) of the mobile maintenance unit (23). The number of bobbin drum (17) rotations, while the yarn is taken up, is selected according to the bobbin drum (17) type. The electromotor drive for the bobbin drum (17) is controlled according to the stored drum type data (x,y), through the workstation computer (39) or the control unit (38) at the mobile maintenance unit (23) deployed at the workstation.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kreuzspulen herstellende Textilmaschine (1), die eine Zentralsteuereinheit (37), eine Vielzahl von Arbeitsstellen (2) sowie ein die Arbeitsstellen (2) selbsttätig versorgendes Serviceaggregat (23) aufweist. Die Arbeitsstellen 2 verfügen dabei jeweils über eine Spuleinrichtung mit einer einzelmotorisch angetriebenen Spultrommel (17) sowie einen Arbeitsstellenrechner (39). Die Zentralsteuereinheit (37) ist über einen Maschinenbus (40) sowohl mit den Arbeitsstellenrechnern (39) als auch mit einer Steuereinrichtung (39) des Serviceaggregat (23) verbunden. Erfindungsgemäß sind in einem Speicher, der beispielweise in die Zentralsteuereinheit (37) integriert ist, spezifische Spultrommeldaten (x, y), insbesondere die Gängigkeit (g) der Spultrommel (17) der Arbeitsstellen (2), abgespeichert. Bei der im Zuge eines Kreuzspulenwechsels notwendigen Fadenaufnahme durch einen Fadenheber (41) des Serviceaggregat (23) ist der elektromotorische Einzelantrieb (50) der Spultrommel (17) so ansteuerbar, daß eine Einstellung der Anzahl der Umdrehungen der Spultrommel (17) auf deren Gängigkeit (g) stattfindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/06 (2006.01); B65H 54/02 (2006.01); B65H 54/22 (2006.01); B65H 54/28 (2006.01); B65H 54/48 (2006.01); B65H 67/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/2881 (2013.01); B65H 54/48 (2013.01); B65H 2402/61 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979791 A2 20000216; EP 0979791 A3 20000329; DE 19836702 A1 20000217; JP 2000072328 A 20000307; TR 9901946 A2 20000321; TR 9901946 A3 20000321; US 6328247 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030326

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI