Global patent index - EP 0979791 A3

EP 0979791 A3 2000-03-29 - Cross wound bobbins producing textile machine

Title (en)

Cross wound bobbins producing textile machine

Title (de)

Kreuzspulen herstellende Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine textile fabricant des bobines croisées

Publication

EP 0979791 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110192 A

Priority

DE 19836702 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0979791A2] The machine (1) for winding cross wound bobbins has a number of winding stations, each with a bobbin drum (17) powered by a separate electromotor with computer (39) control. The memory holds data (x,y) relating to the number of groove paths at the bobbin drum (17). The computer control sets the number of bobbin drum (17) rotations on the start of winding a new bobbin, according to the drum type in use. The data (x,y) relating to the bobbin drum (17) type are stored at the central control (37) of the textile machine (1). The central control (37) is linked by a machine bus (40) with the workstation computer (39) and also the control unit (38) of the mobile maintenance unit (23). The number of bobbin drum (17) rotations, while the yarn is taken up, is selected according to the bobbin drum (17) type. The electromotor drive for the bobbin drum (17) is controlled according to the stored drum type data (x,y), through the workstation computer (39) or the control unit (38) at the mobile maintenance unit (23) deployed at the workstation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/06 (2006.01); B65H 54/02 (2006.01); B65H 54/22 (2006.01); B65H 54/28 (2006.01); B65H 54/48 (2006.01); B65H 67/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/2881 (2013.01); B65H 54/48 (2013.01); B65H 2402/61 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979791 A2 20000216; EP 0979791 A3 20000329; DE 19836702 A1 20000217; JP 2000072328 A 20000307; TR 9901946 A2 20000321; TR 9901946 A3 20000321; US 6328247 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030326

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR IT LI

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI