Global Patent Index - EP 0979792 A3

EP 0979792 A3 2000-08-23 - Belt type traverse apparatus

Title (en)

Belt type traverse apparatus

Title (de)

Fadenchangiervorrichtung vom Riementyp

Title (fr)

Dispositif de va-et-vient pour un fil du type à courroies

Publication

EP 0979792 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99108268 A

Priority

JP 22134898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0979792A2] The present invention relates to a belt type traverse apparatus for transferring a yarn between traverse guides 10c, 11c that are attached to endless belts 10, 11 that are arranged in the vertical direction and travel in opposite direction. A rotary transferring member 13 is disposed near the respective ends of the endless belts to abut the yarn in synchronism with the traverse guide on the yarn receiving side in order to move the yarn in the direction in which it is removed from the traverse guide on the yarn delivering side thereby preventing a yarn traversing motion from being interrupted on a fixed transferring guide as in the prior art. This configuration enables quick traverse turns to improve the winding shape of packages. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/2824 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979792 A2 20000216; EP 0979792 A3 20000823; JP 2000053320 A 20000222; JP 3282589 B2 20020513

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040317

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021107

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI