Global Patent Index - EP 0979794 A2

EP 0979794 A2 2000-02-16 - Take-up winding device

Title (en)

Take-up winding device

Title (de)

Aufwickelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'enroulement

Publication

EP 0979794 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99113720 A

Priority

JP 22643598 A

Abstract (en)

To reliably detect yarn that is wound around a contact roller a take-up winding device for winding up a yarn Y that contacts a contact roller 4 onto a bobbin holder 3 is provided with a light projector 6a and a light receiver 6b that form part of an optical detecting device 6. A yarn detection light beam L passes through the vicinity of the outer circumferential surface 4a of the contact roller 4. The light projector 6a and the light receiver 6b are provided on a side A, which constitutes an open area. The light projector 6a and the light receiver 6b are located in areas where accompanying air flow generated due to the rotation of the contact roller passes through. A lap feeler 10 comprising a detecting member 11 that arranges its tip 11a close to the contact roller's outer circumferential surface 4a is provided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 63/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 63/032 (2006.01); B65H 49/00 (2006.01); B65H 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 63/003 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979794 A2 20000216; EP 0979794 A3 20001102; CN 1244600 A 20000216; JP 2000053327 A 20000222; KR 20000017008 A 20000325; TW 451947 U 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20021111

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020923

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010409

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI