Global patent index - EP 0979797 A1

EP 0979797 A1 2000-02-16 - Filling system

Title (en)

Filling system

Title (de)

Füllsystem

Title (fr)

Dispositif de remplissage

Publication

EP 0979797 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115446 A

Priority

DE 19836500 A

Abstract (en)

The bottle filling system has a number of filling elements (3) associated with a common filling liquid chamber (2) and a pair of common gas chambers (22,25),the delivery line (11) of each filling element containing a centrally controlled filling valve (13) and associated with 3 controlled gas valves (16,17,18) for respective gas paths, controlled for pressure-less filling, or counter-pressure filling using a single-chamber or triple chamber principle.

Abstract (de)

Ein Füllsystem zum Füllen von Flaschen oder dergleichen Behälter mit einem flüssigen Füllgut besitzt mehrere Füllelemente. Jedes Füllelement weist ein Flüssigkeitsventil zur gesteuerten Abgabe des Füllgutes sowie mehrere in einem Gehäuse des Füllelementes ausgebildete Gaskanäle auf, die durch wenigsten drei für jedes Füllelement gesondert vorgesehene und individuell steuerbare Steuerventile derart steuerbar sind, daß ein wahlweises druckloses Füllen, ein Füllen unter Gegendruck nach dem Einkammer-Füllprinzip sowie ein Füllen unter Gegendruck nach dem Dreikammer-Füllprinzip im wesentlichen nur durch Änderung des Steuerprogramms möglich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/12 (2006.01); B67C 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/286 (2013.01); B67C 3/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979797 A1 20000216; EP 0979797 B1 20051012; AT 306459 T 20051015; BR 9904077 A 20000912; DE 19836500 A1 20000217; DE 59912643 D1 20051117; US 6192946 B1 20010227

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-02-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: KHS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 306459

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20111220

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20111121

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20111122

2011-11-23 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20111114

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-07-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: KHS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

- Effective date: 20060426

2006-04-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KHS AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2006-01-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-11-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912643

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-11-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2005-10-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040916

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR GB IT NL

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI