Global patent index - EP 0979805 A1

EP 0979805 A1 2000-02-16 - Composition for generating smoke based on rosin derivatives

Title (en)

Composition for generating smoke based on rosin derivatives

Title (de)

Rauch erzeugende Zusammensetzung auf Basis von Kolophonium-Derivate

Title (fr)

Composition fumigène à base de dérivés de colophane

Publication

EP 0979805 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402010 A

Priority

FR 9810245 A

Abstract (en)

The smoke oxydo-reductant composition comprises of an oxidant of combustion, a reductant of combustion and a smoke agent which generates particles during combustion. The smoke agent contains one or several colophane or hydrogenated colophane esters. The composition contains: 30-55 wt.% of smoke agent 25-40 wt.% of the oxidant of combustion 20-30 wt.% of reductant of combustion.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention a pour objet une composition fumigène oxydo-réductrice contenant un ou plusieurs esters de colophane ou de colophane hydrogénée avec un alcool. Application notamment dans un dispositif de dissuasion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C06D 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06D 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] LU 85676 A1 19860717 - RADERMECKER INTERCHIMIE S A [BE]
  • [A] FR 2089816 A5 19720107 - LINDESBERGS IND AB
  • [A] US H233 H 19870303
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 112, no. 24, 11 June 1990, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 219929z, A. VAMOS ET AL.: "Smoke-generating agent for tightness test of smoke passages." page 178; XP000155896 & HU 49837 A
  • [A] B. ELVERS ET AL.: "Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, 5th revised edition, Vol. A23", 1993, VCH, WEINHEIM, DE, XP002099878

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979805 A1 20000216; CA 2280394 A1 20000210; FR 2782078 A1 20000211; FR 2782078 B1 20001103; US 6436210 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030122

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI