Global Patent Index - EP 0979861 A1

EP 0979861 A1 2000-02-16 - Fabric care compositions

Title (en)

Fabric care compositions

Title (de)

Gewebepflegmittel

Title (fr)

Compositions d'entretien des tissus

Publication

EP 0979861 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98870174 A

Priority

EP 98870174 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a method for preventing or reducing the fading of colour on fabric by means of a divalent salt. Compositions which provide care to the color of fabrics and comprising a dye fixing agent and the divalent salt are also herein provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 7/10; C11D 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06P 5/08 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/02 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/24 (2006.01); C11D 3/26 (2006.01); C11D 3/28 (2006.01); C11D 3/32 (2006.01); C11D 3/34 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); D06M 11/00 (2006.01); D06M 11/56 (2006.01); D06M 13/463 (2006.01); D06P 1/56 (2006.01); D06P 1/673 (2006.01); D06P 3/66 (2006.01); D06P 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/046 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 3/001 (2013.01); C11D 3/122 (2013.01); C11D 3/1233 (2013.01); C11D 3/2072 (2013.01); C11D 3/2082 (2013.01); C11D 3/24 (2013.01); C11D 3/26 (2013.01); C11D 3/28 (2013.01); C11D 3/323 (2013.01); C11D 3/3454 (2013.01); C11D 3/3703 (2013.01); C11D 3/3719 (2013.01); C11D 3/3723 (2013.01); C11D 3/3757 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979861 A1 20000216; EP 0979861 B1 20041215; AT 284947 T 20050115; AU 5252699 A 20000228; BR 9912711 A 20010502; BR 9912711 B1 20090811; CA 2338762 A1 20000217; CA 2338762 C 20070410; CN 1314938 A 20010926; DE 69828162 D1 20050120; DE 69828162 T2 20051222; JP 2002522651 A 20020723; US 2005108835 A1 20050526; WO 0008128 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69828162

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120803

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120803

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110831

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090812

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090806

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050515

2006-05-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-08-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050326

2005-03-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050315

2005-03-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050315

2005-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050315

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69828162 P 20050120

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041215

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030328

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI