Global patent index - EP 0979862 A1

EP 0979862 A1 2000-02-16 - Multilayer detergent tablet with different hardness

Title (en)

Multilayer detergent tablet with different hardness

Title (de)

Mehrschichtwaschmitteltabletten mit unterschiedlicher Härte

Title (fr)

Comprimés détergents multicouches à dureté différente

Publication

EP 0979862 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98202711 A

Priority

EP 98202711 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a detergent tablet having at least a first and a second layer, whereby the first layer is softer than the second layer, and if said tablet has more than two layers, the tablet is such that a softer layer is situated at an end of the tablet to increase the integrity and robustness of the entire tablet during production, shipping and handling while keeping substantially good dispensing properties.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/34 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3409 (2013.01); C11D 17/0078 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979862 A1 20000216; AU 5556699 A 20000306; BR 9913004 A 20010508; CA 2338959 A1 20000224; CN 1322239 A 20011114; JP 2002522631 A 20020723; WO 0009646 A1 20000224

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050214

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041001

2000-11-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI LI

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI