Global patent index - EP 0979866 A1

EP 0979866 A1 2000-02-16 - Detergent tablet

Title (en)

Detergent tablet

Title (de)

Waschmitteltablette

Title (fr)

Comprimé détergent

Publication

EP 0979866 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99305387 A

Priority

  • GB 9815525 A
  • GB 9911264 A

Abstract (en)

A multi-phase detergent tablet comprising: a) a first phase in the form of a shaped body having at least one mould therein; and b) a second phase in the form of a compressed body adhesively contained within said mould, wherein the tablet composition comprises one or more detergent actives which is predominantly concentrated in the second phase, and wherein the second phase additionally comprises a disrupting agent. The multi-phase tablets provide improved dissolution and cleaning characteristics together with excellent tablet integrity and strength.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/42 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0078 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 3/126 (2013.01); C11D 3/1273 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/3707 (2013.01); C11D 3/3776 (2013.01); C11D 3/3792 (2013.01); C11D 3/386 (2013.01); C11D 3/38609 (2013.01); C11D 3/38645 (2013.01); C11D 3/42 (2013.01); C11D 17/0086 (2013.01); C11D 17/0091 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

"BENCKISER", ANNOUNCEMENT BENCKISER, XX, XX, 19 December 1996 (1996-12-19), XX, pages 01, XP002932884

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0004124 A2 20000127; WO 0004124 A3 20000420; AT 213767 T 20020315; AT 242311 T 20030615; AT 243737 T 20030715; AT 338808 T 20060915; AU 4964499 A 20000207; BR 9912157 A 20010410; CA 2333468 A1 20000127; CA 2333468 C 20040120; CN 1309692 A 20010822; DE 29911484 U1 20000224; DE 69900931 D1 20020404; DE 69900931 T2 20021107; DE 69908604 D1 20030710; DE 69908604 T2 20040429; DE 69909095 D1 20030731; DE 69909095 T2 20040506; DE 69933143 D1 20061019; DE 69933143 T2 20070802; DK 0979866 T3 20020617; EP 0979866 A1 20000216; EP 0979866 B1 20020227; EP 1097192 A2 20010509; EP 1097192 B1 20030625; ES 2173707 T3 20021016; ES 2199905 T3 20040301; ES 2201741 T3 20040316; ES 2272825 T3 20070501; FI 4408 U1 20000518; FI 990322 U0 19990716; FR 2782090 A1 20000211; FR 2782090 B1 20040709; IE S990572 A2 20000308; IT MI991511 A1 20000118; IT MI991511 D0 19990709; IT MI991567 A1 20010115; IT MI991567 D0 19990715; JP 2002520479 A 20020709; NL 1012585 A1 20000119; NL 1012585 C1 20000125; PL 346179 A1 20020128; PT 979866 E 20020731; RU 2208628 C2 20030720; SK 602001 A3 20010611; TR 200100096 T2 20010621

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160624

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120708

2013-10-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20131018

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110706

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090708

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69900931

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090707

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-02-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *PROCTER & GAMBLE CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20100731

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100204

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-07-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090707

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090707

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090707

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100107

2010-04-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2010-03-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2010-03-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090817

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-26 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-01-19 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100107

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090730

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080707

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080704

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080708

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080718

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080708

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-09-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070714

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-02-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021128

2003-02-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2002-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2173707

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-06 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20020401215

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-06-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-06-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69900931

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-04

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 213767

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990716

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI