Global Patent Index - EP 0979884 A1

EP 0979884 A1 2000-02-16 - Spinning device with after heater

Title (en)

Spinning device with after heater

Title (de)

Spinnvorrichtung mit Nacherhitzungsschacht

Title (fr)

Dispositif de filage avec appareil d'après chauffage

Publication

EP 0979884 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99108819 A

Priority

DE 19836682 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19836682C1] The door (1) structure of an after-heater (9), in the path of melt-spun filaments on leaving the spinneret, has a heated metal body (1a). An insulation (1b) is next to the metal body (1a), with a vertical suction channel (1c) at its outer side opening into a horizontal suction channel (1d) at its lower end. The upper part (1e) of the door is linked to a lever (2) as part of a lever mechanism composed of at least one lever, bearing mounting (3) and a counterweight (4). The upper end (1f) of the suction channel (1c) is linked to a flexible hose (7). The upper part (1e) of the door (1) can be linked to two levers (2), each fitted with a draw spring (6) secured to a further mounting (5). The lower part is linked to at least one further lever (8). The vertical suction channel (1c) has a rectangular cross section flow shape at the transit connection to the horizontal suction channel (1d), with a width and height which decrease continuously over the height of the door (1) into a circular cross section at the upper end (1f). The vertical suction channel (1c) is formed by an outer plate (1g) in a release fitting. The lower horizontal suction channel (1d) is defined by a second lower plate, in a release mounting with a vertical sliding movement.

Abstract (de)

Die Spinnvorrichtung dient dem Erzeugen von Filamenten aus schmelzflüssigem Polymer, welches durch einen Spinnkopf mit Spinndüsen ausgepreßt wird, wobei die Filamente nach unten zunächst durch einen Nacherhitzungsschacht (9) und dann durch einen Blasschacht laufen. Der Nacherhitzungsschacht (9) ist mit einer vertikal bewegbaren Tür (1) versehen, welche einen beheizbaren Metallkörper (1a), eine am Metallkörper angeordnete thermische Isolierung (1b) und einen an der Isolierung außen vertikal angeordneten Absaugkanal (1c) aufweist. Der Absaugkanal geht im unteren Teil in einen nahezu horizontal verlaufenden Absaugkanal (1a) über und ist mit einer Absaugmündung (5) am Nacherhitzungsschacht versehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 5/084

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/084 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01D 5/084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DD 246796 A1 19870617 - SCHWARZA CHEMIEFASER [DD]
  • [A] US 3067458 A 19621211 - DAUCHERT EUGENE F
  • [A] US 2947029 A 19600802 - WILLEM BAKKER
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 197618, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A23, AN 1976-33145X, XP002123804
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 338 (C - 527) 12 September 1988 (1988-09-12)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19836682 C1 19991014; EP 0979884 A1 20000216; EP 0979884 B1 20041117; US 6312245 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130504

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131201

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130504

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59911075

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130504

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-12-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131201

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120529

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120601

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120523

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: LURGI ZIMMER GMBH

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-08-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: ZIMMER GMBH

2009-08-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: ZIAG PLANT ENGINEERING GMBH

2009-02-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2009-01-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2008-08-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: LURGI ZIMMER GMBH

- Free text: ZIMMER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#BORSIGALLEE 1#60388 FRANKFURT AM MAIN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- LURGI ZIMMER GMBH#LURGIALLEE 5#60295 FRANKFURT AM MAIN (DE)

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-03-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050222

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911075 P 20041223

2004-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZIMMER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000815

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI