Global Patent Index - EP 0979887 A1

EP 0979887 A1 2000-02-16 - Fibre channel plate for an open-end spinning machine

Title (en)

Fibre channel plate for an open-end spinning machine

Title (de)

Faserkanalplatte für eine Offenend-Spinnvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Plague avec un canal à fibre pour un métier à filer à bout libre

Publication

EP 0979887 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107962 A

Priority

DE 19836073 A

Abstract (en)

The fiber feed channel plate (4), at an open-end spinner, has a channel plate adapter (10) in a release mounting held in place only by a force fit using a magnetic coupling (15). The magnetic coupling (15) has at least one permanent magnet (14) fixed to or inserted into the fiber channel plate (4) or the channel plate adapter (10), together with a ferromagnetic component facing it axially at the other section, and especially as a disk (18). An air gap (23) of at least 0.1 mm is between the permanent magnet (14) and the ferromagnetic component. The magnetic force between the fiber channel plate (4) and the adapter plate (10) is a multiple of the max. force required to open and close the cover.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Offenend-Spinnvorrichtung (1) mit einem besaugten, nach vorne offenen Rotorgehäuse (2), einem innerhalb des Rotorgehäuses mit hoher Drehzahl umlaufenden Spinnrotor (3) sowie einer Faserkanalplatte (4) zum Verschließen des Rotorgehäuses. Die Faserkanalplatte (4) besitzt einen den Mündungsbereich eines Faserleitkanals und eine Faserabzugsdüse aufweisenden, auswechselbar angeordneten Kanalplattenadapter (10). Die Befestigung des lösbar an der Faserkanalplatte (4) festlegbaren Kanalplattenadapters (10) erfolgt nur kraftschlüssig und das kraftschlüssige Befestigungsmittel ist als Magnetkupplung (15) ausgebildet, die eine im Bedarfsfall leicht und schnell lösbare, während des Betriebes bzw. des Zusammenbaus jedoch sichere und exakte Fixierung des Kanalplattenadapters (10) in einer Aufnahme (7) der Faserkanalplatte (4) bietet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/10 (2006.01); D01H 4/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19617527 A1 19971113 - SCHLAFHORST & CO W [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979887 A1 20000216; EP 0979887 B1 20030910; CN 1244601 A 20000216; DE 19836073 A1 20000217; JP 2000064129 A 20000229; US 6240717 B1 20010605

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050422

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906929

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020809

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE IT LI

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI