Global Patent Index - EP 0979888 A1

EP 0979888 A1 2000-02-16 - Open-end spinning device

Title (en)

Open-end spinning device

Title (de)

Offenend-Spinnvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Métier à filer à bout ouvert

Publication

EP 0979888 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107123 A

Priority

DE 19836066 A

Abstract (en)

Channel (14) to carry the separated fibers from the sliver to the spinning chamber, in an open end spinner, has walls at the entry section (29) with a coarser surface roughness than the surfaces of the channel walls at the outlet section (30) of the channel. The depth of the surface roughness, in the walls of both channel sections (29, 30), is less than the average single fiber diameter (10 micro m). Preferred Features: The surface roughness of the channel wall at the channel entry section (29) has a depth of ≥ 4 micro m (4-6 micro m). The wall surfaces at the entry section (29) of the fiber feed channel (14) are coated with a nickel dispersion with embedded hard granules (35) of diamonds or silicon carbide. The entry section (29) of the channel (14) is in a fiber guide channel unit (36), in a drilling (37) at the housing (17) for the sliver loosening roller. The wall surfaces of the outlet section (30) of the fiber feed channel (14) have a roughness depth of ≤ 4 micro m (2-3 micro m). The center axis (34) of the outlet section (30) of the fiber feed channel (14) is at an angle ( alpha ) to the center axis (33) of the entry section (29) of the channel (14). The outlet section (30) of the fiber feed channel (14) is a component part of an exchangeable channel plate adapter (12).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Offenend-Spinnvorrichtung (1) mit einem Spinnrotor (3), dessen Spinntasse mit hoher Drehzahl in einem besaugbaren, durch eine Faserkanalplatte verschließbaren Rotorgehäuse (2) umläuft. Die OE-Spinnvorrichtung besitzt einen zwischen einer Faserbandauflöseeinrichtung (26) und der Spinntasse angeordneten Faserleitkanal (14), der einen Wandungsabschnitt mit erhöhtem Reibungskoeffizienten aufweist. Erfindungsgemäß besitzt der Faserleitkanal (14) Kanalabschnitte (29, 30), deren Wandungen jeweils eine unterschiedliche Rauhtiefe aufweisen. Die Wandung des eingangsseitigen Faserleitkanalabschnittes (29) besitzt dabei eine deutlich größere Rauhtiefe (Rt) als die Wandung des ausgangsseitigen Faserleitkanalabschnittes (30). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 4/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 4/38 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 9218361 U1 19940310 - RIETER INGOLSTADT SPINNEREI [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979888 A1 20000216; EP 0979888 B1 20030319; CZ 298763 B6 20080123; CZ 9902752 A3 20000216; DE 19836066 A1 20000217; JP 2000064130 A 20000229; US 6047538 A 20000411

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-01 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20090514

2008-07-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

2007-07-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

2007-05-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SPINDELFABRIK SUESSEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20031219

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2005-04-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SPINDELFABRIK SUESSEN SCHURR, STAHLECKER & GRI

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904597 P 20030424

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI