Global patent index - EP 0979896 A2

EP 0979896 A2 2000-02-16 - Calender for paper webs or similar material

Title (en)

Calender for paper webs or similar material

Title (de)

Kalanderanordnung für Bahnen aus Papier oder ähnlichem Material

Title (fr)

Calandre pour bandes de papier ou analoque

Publication

EP 0979896 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98122735 A

Priority

DE 19832065 A

Abstract (en)

The calender assembly, for processing webs of paper and similar materials, has a stack of calender rollers on a plane (E) at an angle to the horizontal. The rollers are on the angled upper side of the pillars. At least one roller (6) is moved upwards by a setting mechanism (49), at right angles to the common roller plane (E). The setting mechanism (49) moves the roller (6) outwards sufficiently for it to be grasped directly at the roller ends by a crane (48), to be lifted upwards clear of the calender. The hydraulic setting mechanism (49) moves the roller (6) along a guide. The calender roller (6) has a bearing pedestal which is in a release fitting at a carrier lever (27) at the pillar. The setting mechanism (49) has a hydraulic cylinder and piston, along the roller carrier lever (27). The setting mechanism (49) has a trough to support an end of the roller (6), carried by a slide between the hydraulic cylinder and the lever (27), mounted to the piston. The removable roller (6) is a center roller in a roller stack. The common roller plane (E) is at an angle of 30-60 degrees to the horizontal or 45 degrees .

Abstract (de)

Eine Kalanderanordnung für Bahnen aus Papier oder ähnlichem Material weist einen Ständer und einen Stapel daran gehaltener Walzen auf. Deren Achsen liegen in einer etwa parallel zu einer Ständerseite verlaufenden gemeinsamen Ebene (E). Diese gemeinsame Ebene (E) verläuft schrägt zur Horizontalen. Die Walzen sind an der schrägen Oberseite des Ständers angeordnet. Mindestens eine Walze (6) ist mittels einer Stellvorrichtung (49) etwa rechtwinklig zur gemeinsamen Ebene (E) nach oben verlagerbar. Auf diese Weise sind die Walzen zwecks Auswechslung besser zugänglich. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/0293 (2013.01); D21G 1/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0972879 A2 20000119; EP 0972879 A3 20000223; EP 0972879 B1 20030502; AT 239133 T 20030515; CA 2277593 A1 20000116; CA 2277593 C 20040224; DE 19832065 A1 20000120; EP 0979896 A2 20000216; EP 0979896 A3 20000223; EP 0979896 B1 20021106; US 6247398 B1 20010619

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051121

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2005-11-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051121

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030217

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59806192

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-12

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011123

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEBR. LANG GMBH PAPIERFABRIK

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000226

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEBR. LANG GMBH PAPIERFABRIK

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI