Global Patent Index - EP 0979898 A1

EP 0979898 A1 2000-02-16 - Spreading device

Title (en)

Spreading device

Title (de)

Streugerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'épandage

Publication

EP 0979898 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115625 A

Priority

DE 29814353 U

Abstract (en)

The spreading occurs onto a strip-shaped surface, the width of which corresponds to the axial length of the spreader roller. A spreader plate (2) is driven to rotate around a vertical axis on a surface defined by its peripheral spread width. The two kinds of spreading can be brought into play separately by a changeover device. A trough (6) beneath the spreader roller is formed in the spreading area of a spreading material storage container and provided with spreader apertures together with a displaced passage for issue of spreading material on to the distribution surface of the spreader plate. A control slide abuts on the trough base wall along which it is displaceably arranged and preferably has several access apertures.

Abstract (de)

Streugerät, insbesondere für den Anbau an ein Fahrzeug, für das wahlweise verteilende Ausstreuen von Streugut - Sand, Salz oder dergleichen - zum einen mittels einer um eine etwa horizontale Achse rotierend angetriebenen sogenannten Streuwalze (3) auf eine streifenförmige Fläche, deren Streifenbreite etwa der axialen Länge der Streuwalze (3) entspricht, und zum anderen mittels eines um eine etwa vertikale Achse rotierend angetriebenen Streutellers (2) auf eine durch die umfängliche Streuweite des drehenden Streutellers (2) definierte Fläche, wobei die beiden Streuarten mittels einer Umsteuereinrichtung jeweils separat einschaltbar sind, welches Streugerät zum Zwecke robuster Herstellung, einfacher Handhabung und hinsichtlich der Einstellbarkeit der Menge des Streugutes im Streuwalzenbetrieb derart ausgebildet ist, daß die Streuwalze (3) von einer im Abstreubereich eines Streugutvorratsbehälters ausgebildeten, über ihre Länge verteilt angeordnete Streuöffnungen (5) sowie einen dazu versetzt angeordneten Durchlaß (7) für die Übergabe des Streugutes auf die Verteilfläche eines Streutellers (2) aufweisenden Wanne (6) untergriffen ist und daß zwischen der Wanne und der Walze (3) ein Steuerschieber (1) angeordnet ist, der entweder um eine etwa parallel zur Walzenachse verlaufende Schwenkachse drehbar oder in Achsrichtung der Walzenachse verschiebbar ist, der vorzugsweise mehrere Übertrittsöffnungen aufweist, die je nach Verdreh- bzw. Verschiebestellungen des Steuerschiebers (1) die Streuöffnungen (5) in der Wanne (6) mehr oder weniger freigibt oder unter Verschließen der Steueröffnungen den Durchlaß (7) zum Streuteller (2) öffnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/202 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3502569 C2 19950713 - EPOKE MASCHINENBAU ALFRED THOM [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979898 A1 20000216; EP 0979898 B1 20031029; AT 253143 T 20031115

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070807

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060815

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070808

2008-04-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060815

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUNPAT BRAUN EDER AG

2006-10-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061017

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060815

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-08-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060811

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907515 P 20031204

2003-11-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PA ALDO ROEMPLER

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI SE

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR LI SE

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000104

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI