Global Patent Index - EP 0979907 A3

EP 0979907 A3 2000-02-23 - Floor-edge formwork

Title (en)

Floor-edge formwork

Title (de)

Schalungswinkel für Decken

Title (fr)

Coffrage pour bordure de dalle

Publication

EP 0979907 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99114906 A

Priority

DE 29813864 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0979907A2] The contact surface runs in the area of the lateral longitudinal ends of the locating plate and the side plate. The locating plate and the side plate are formed as multi-layer light concrete plates and have outer surfaces and inner surfaces running at right-angles to one another. The inner surface (6) of the locating plate (2) and the inner surface (4) of the side plate (1) have a connecting surface (6A, 4A), to which at least one reinforcement component (3) can be applied. One side surface of the reinforcement component (3) abuts as locating surface (3A) on the connecting surface (6A) of the locating plate (2) and one side surface abuts as locating surface (3B) on the connecting surface (4A) of the side plate (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/32 (2013.01); E04B 2005/322 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29813864 U1 19981105; EP 0979907 A2 20000216; EP 0979907 A3 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051123

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030612

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000819

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI