Global Patent Index - EP 0979911 A2

EP 0979911 A2 2000-02-16 - Height adjustable floor surface

Title (en)

Height adjustable floor surface

Title (de)

Höhenverstellbare Bodenfläche

Title (fr)

Surface de sol ajustable en hauteur

Publication

EP 0979911 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115378 A

Priority

  • DE 29814246 U
  • DE 29900495 U
  • DE 29903147 U

Abstract (en)

The device comprises adjustable room units which are fixed in place and consists of adjustable floor units and/or technical arrangement units. The units are located above a base floor and below a support system located beneath the ceiling. The units are moved using individual automated adjuster units which move along guide tracks. The adjuster units enable the room units to be moved both horizontally and vertically.

Abstract (de)

Eine höhenverstellbare Bodenfläche für Mehrzweckbauten ist zu ihrer auch stufenweise steigenden oder fallenden Umwandlung in eine höher oder tiefer gelegene Ebene aus mehreren individuell höhenverstellbaren Plattformen (P) zusammengestellt. Die Plattformen (P) werden in ihrer Höhenlage mittels Hubwerke (H) individuell eingestellt und mittels Stützeinrichtungen abgestützt. Anschließend werden die mobilen Hubwerke (H) entlastet und entfernt. Die in ihrer nicht wirksamen Situation ortsbeweglichen oder lagebeweglichen Stützeinrichtungen (S) werden zu ihrer Benutzung an die Plattformen (P) oder den Anordnungsbereich der Plattformen (P) herangeführt oder mit den Plattformen (P) verbunden und von diesen dann mitgeführt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 7/00 (2006.01); B66F 11/04 (2006.01); E04G 1/22 (2006.01); E04H 3/12 (2006.01); E04H 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 11/04 (2013.01); B66F 7/00 (2013.01); E04G 1/22 (2013.01); E04H 3/126 (2013.01); E04H 3/26 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2545074 C3 19810619

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979911 A2 20000216; EP 0979911 A3 20010411

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020412

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04H 3/26 A, 7E 04H 3/12 B

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI