Global patent index - EP 0979911 A3

EP 0979911 A3 2001-04-11 - Height adjustable floor surface

Title (en)

Height adjustable floor surface

Title (de)

Höhenverstellbare Bodenfläche

Title (fr)

Surface de sol ajustable en hauteur

Publication

EP 0979911 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99115378 A

Priority

  • DE 29814246 U
  • DE 29900495 U
  • DE 29903147 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0979911A2] The device comprises adjustable room units which are fixed in place and consists of adjustable floor units and/or technical arrangement units. The units are located above a base floor and below a support system located beneath the ceiling. The units are moved using individual automated adjuster units which move along guide tracks. The adjuster units enable the room units to be moved both horizontally and vertically.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 3/26; E04H 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 7/00 (2006.01); B66F 11/04 (2006.01); E04G 1/22 (2006.01); E04H 3/12 (2006.01); E04H 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66F 11/04 (2013.01); B66F 7/00 (2013.01); E04G 1/22 (2013.01); E04H 3/126 (2013.01); E04H 3/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979911 A2 20000216; EP 0979911 A3 20010411

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020412

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04H 3/26 A, 7E 04H 3/12 B

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI