Global patent index - EP 0979916 A1

EP 0979916 A1 2000-02-16 - Door stop

Title (en)

Door stop

Title (de)

Türstopper

Title (fr)

Arrêt de porte

Publication

EP 0979916 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114991 A

Priority

DE 19836340 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19836340C1] The door stop (12) has a stop section (18) anchored to the floor and with a wedge (20) to fit under the door leaf. The wedge is annular and surrounds the stop section(18). The wedge has angled surfaces.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Türstopper (12) beschrieben, der einen Anschlagteil (18) zur seitlichen Abfangung des Türflügels (14) aufweist, wobei dieser Anschlagteil einen Auflaufteil für die untere Türkante (16) aufweist, der die Unterkante des am Anschlagteil (18) anliegenden Türflügels reibungsschlüssig festlegt und ein Zurückschlagen verhindert. Der Türstopper wird zweckmäßigerweise mittels Dübel (36) und Schraube (38) in einem Bohrloch (34) des Zimmerbodens verankert. Aus visuellen Gründen ist das Durchgangsloch mit einer Verschlußkappe (42) abschließbar. Der die reibungsschlüssige Festlegung der Tür bewirkende Ringwulst besitzt eine schraubenlinienförmige keilförmige Steigung, die eine Anpassung an den jeweiligen Türspalt ermöglicht. Zur Anpassung an extrem große Türspalte sind Distanz-Ausgleichs-Scheiben (48) vorgesehen, die den Türstopper tragen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 17/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/00 (2006.01); E05C 17/52 (2006.01); E05F 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 17/00 (2013.01); E05C 17/52 (2013.01); E05F 5/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19836340 C1 20000127; EP 0979916 A1 20000216

INPADOC legal status

2001-04-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI