Global Patent Index - EP 0979922 A2

EP 0979922 A2 2000-02-16 - Tube rod

Title (en)

Tube rod

Title (de)

Bohrgestänge mit Innenrohr

Title (fr)

Tige de forage avec conduit intérieur

Publication

EP 0979922 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99305930 A

Priority

GB 9816494 A

Abstract (en)

A tube rod for rock drilling has a female threaded end (12) into which a male thread (either on a male connector or on the end of another tube rod) can be screwed to form part of a drill string. The female threaded end (12) is (a) of larger external diameter than the central section (10) of the rod and (b) has an annular groove (42%) with an asymmetrical profile, the flank of this groove nearest to the threaded end being steeper than the other flank. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 17/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/042 (2013.01); E21B 17/0426 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT FI GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979922 A2 20000216; EP 0979922 A3 20010117; EP 0979922 B1 20040128; AT 258645 T 20040215; CA 2278987 A1 20000130; GB 2340148 A 20000216; GB 2340148 B 20021231; GB 9816494 D0 19980923

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130727

2014-03-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120710

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-05-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT FI SE

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT FI GB SE

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-01-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020620

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT FI GB SE

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROBERTS, NIGEL

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YAO, JAMES

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT FI GB SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI