Global Patent Index - EP 0979922 A3

EP 0979922 A3 2001-01-17 - Tube rod

Title (en)

Tube rod

Title (de)

Bohrgestänge mit Innenrohr

Title (fr)

Tige de forage avec conduit intérieur

Publication

EP 0979922 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99305930 A

Priority

GB 9816494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0979922A2] A tube rod for rock drilling has a female threaded end (12) into which a male thread (either on a male connector or on the end of another tube rod) can be screwed to form part of a drill string. The female threaded end (12) is (a) of larger external diameter than the central section (10) of the rod and (b) has an annular groove (42%) with an asymmetrical profile, the flank of this groove nearest to the threaded end being steeper than the other flank. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 17/042

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/042 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/042 (2013.01); E21B 17/0426 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979922 A2 20000216; EP 0979922 A3 20010117; EP 0979922 B1 20040128; AT 258645 T 20040215; CA 2278987 A1 20000130; GB 2340148 A 20000216; GB 2340148 B 20021231; GB 9816494 D0 19980923

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130727

2014-03-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120710

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-05-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT FI SE

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT FI GB SE

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020620

2001-11-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT FI GB SE

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010717

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROBERTS, NIGEL

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YAO, JAMES

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT FI GB SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI