Global Patent Index - EP 0979923 A1

EP 0979923 A1 2000-02-16 - Installation for the exploitation of an offshore oil deposit and method for mounting a riser

Title (en)

Installation for the exploitation of an offshore oil deposit and method for mounting a riser

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Ausbeutung einer Erdöllagerstätte in der See und Verfahren zur Aufstellung eines Risers

Title (fr)

Installation d'exploitation d'un gisement en mer et procédé d'implantation d'une colonne montante

Publication

EP 0979923 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402019 A

Priority

FR 9810301 A

Abstract (en)

In an installation for extracting oil from seabed deposits, the rising column (24) of a semi-submersible platform (10) is kept under tension by one or more submerged float (28) and a pulling mechanism (30) mounted on the platform. An abutment holds the float against the platform. The float(s) are sized to apply a traction force on the rising column which is greater than that applied by the mechanism, preferably 1-3 times the weight of the column. The platform includes an immersed base (16) and a floating hull (12) connected by legs (14). The float(s) are placed at the depth of the base, which has vertical guides for each float. The base contains a vertical passage (22) for each float, in which the float can move axially. Each float contains a conduit through which the associated rising column extends. A universal joint links the float and the rising column, having a concave annular seat fixed to the float in the axial conduit and a convex collar carried on the column. The collar presses on the seat to apply the traction. The conduit has a diameter greater than three times that of the column. The traction mechanism at the top of the column has at least one hydro-pneumatic jack with a pulley assembly at each end on which at least one sling applies traction to the column. An Independent claim is also included for the installation of a rising column comprising ensuring the abutment holds the float vertically against the platform, submersing the column with its lower end held at a distance from the seabed, ballasting the platform, lowering the column and connecting it to the seabed, disengaging the abutment between the float and the platform, and deballasting the platform.

Abstract (fr)

L'installation d'exploitation d'un gisement en mer comporte une plate-forme semi-submersible (10), au moins une colonne montante (24) reliant la plate-forme (10) au fond marin (F), et des moyens (28, 30) de mise sous tension de ladite colonne montante (24). Les moyens de mise sous tension comportent, pour la ou chaque colonne montante (24), au moins un flotteur (28) immergé, relié en un point de la partie courante de la colonne montante (24) pour sa traction vers la surface, et un mécanisme (30) de traction de la colonne montante (24), lequel mécanisme (30) est installé sur la plate-forme (10) et appliqué en tête de la colonne montante (24). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 19/00; E21B 17/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/01 (2006.01); E21B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 19/006 (2013.01); E21B 17/012 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FI FR GB IE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979923 A1 20000216; EP 0979923 B1 20050112; AU 4347799 A 20000302; AU 754800 B2 20021128; AU 754800 C 20030612; BR 9904472 A 20000829; CA 2280399 A1 20000211; CA 2280399 C 20071002; EA 001520 B1 20010423; EA 199900640 A2 20000228; EA 199900640 A3 20000424; FR 2782341 A1 20000218; FR 2782341 B1 20001103; ID 25956 A 20001116; NO 315529 B1 20030915; NO 993852 A 20000214; NO 993852 D0 19990810; US 2002048492 A1 20020425; US 6347912 B1 20020219; US 6406223 B1 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160809

2015-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150720

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150813

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050319

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FI FR GB IE

2005-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050112

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FI FR GB IE

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FI FR GB IE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI