Global patent index - EP 0979926 A2

EP 0979926 A2 2000-02-16 - Tunnel excavating process and tunnel excavator

Title (en)

Tunnel excavating process and tunnel excavator

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Tunnels und Tunnelvortriebsmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé d'excavation de tunnels et machine de creusement

Publication

EP 0979926 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99115503 A

Priority

JP 22896798 A

Abstract (en)

Provided are a tunnel excavating process which can reduce pressure required in excavation and excavate under lower pressure than the prior art even if compressive strength of base rocks is high, and a tunnel excavator capable of suitably executing the process. A plurality of roller cutter groups are arranged at given intervals in an excavating direction and in a direction vertical thereto, and points of roller cutters belonging to each roller cutter group in contact with base rocks are located in the vicinity of a difference in level portion formed in the base rocks to excavate the base rocks. There is constituted a tunnel excavator 1 in which a plurality of roller cutter groups 3x are arranged at given intervals in an excavating direction and in a direction vertical thereto on a cutter head 2 having a substantially conical shape. A boring head 4 can be disposed coaxial with the cutter head 2 to bore a pilot tunnel 7. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21D 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/10 (2006.01); E02D 29/045 (2006.01); E21D 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21D 9/104 (2013.01); E21D 9/1026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979926 A2 20000216; EP 0979926 A3 20000823; CA 2280113 A1 20000213; JP 2000064788 A 20000229; JP 3489092 B2 20040119

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020716

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010219

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI