Global Patent Index - EP 0979944 A2

EP 0979944 A2 2000-02-16 - Bypass valve arrangement for a high pressure cleaner and high pressure cleaner with such a bypass valve arrangement

Title (en)

Bypass valve arrangement for a high pressure cleaner and high pressure cleaner with such a bypass valve arrangement

Title (de)

Bypassventilanordnung für ein Hochdruckreinigungsgerät sowie Hochdruckreinigungsgerät mit einer solchen Bypassventilanordnung

Title (fr)

Agencement de soupape de dérivation pour un nettoyeur à haute pression et nettoyeur à haute pression avec un tel agencement de soupape de dérivation

Publication

EP 0979944 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115736 A

Priority

  • DE 19836407 A
  • DE 19838947 A

Abstract (en)

The pressure washer pistol (2) has a bypass vlave (14) with a secondary actuator (30) with a cylinder (31) having a bias piston (32) connected to the vlave. The piston fdefines a hydraulic control chambers (33,34) for the openign and closing movement of the valve.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist eine Bypassventilanordnung für ein Hochdruckreinigungsgerät mit einer Förderpumpe (5) für Reinigungsflüssigkeit. Wesentlich für die erfindungsgemäße Bypassventilanordnung ist, daß zusätzlich zu der ersten Betätigungseinrichtung (20) für den Arbeitsdruck eine zweite, unabhängige Betätigungseinrichtung (30) für den Haltedruck vorgesehen ist, die eine Entlastung der Druckleitung (4) auf einen sehr niedrigen Haltedruck unabhängig vom Arbeitsdruck erlaubt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 49/24; B08B 3/02; F16K 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/02 (2006.01); F04B 49/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 49/246 (2013.01); B08B 3/026 (2013.01); B08B 2203/0205 (2013.01); F04B 2205/151 (2013.01); F04B 2205/172 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979944 A2 20000216; EP 0979944 A3 20001018

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI