Global patent index - EP 0979945 A2

EP 0979945 A2 2000-02-16 - Magnetic coupling system and use of it for a gear pump

Title (en)

Magnetic coupling system and use of it for a gear pump

Title (de)

Vorrichtung mit einer Magnetkupplung und Verwendung derselben für eine Zahnradpumpe

Title (fr)

Couplage magnetique pour pompe à engrenages

Publication

EP 0979945 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122988 A

Priority

EP 99122988 A

Abstract (en)

The gear pump device has a magnetic coupling (2) for contactless torque transmission from a first shaft (13) coupled to a drive unit to the pump shaft (7) in a casing (21). One of the shafts has an inner rotor (17) and the other has an outer rotor (12) with a magnet (19). The shaft driven by the drive unit is pivoted to the rotor on the drive side. The axis of this rotor can be fixed radially by fixing element (8) able to be connected to the casing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung mit einer Magnetkupplung (2) zum berührungsfreien Übertragen eines Drehmomentes von einer ersten, mit einer Antriebseinheit gekoppelten Welle (13) auf eine zweite, in einem Gehäuse (21) gelagerten Welle (7), wobei eine der Wellen (7) mit einem Magnete (18) aufweisenden inneren Rotor (17) und die andere Welle (13) mit einem Magnete (19) aufweisenden äusseren Rotor (12) versehen ist. Erfindungsgemäss ist die von der Antriebseinheit angetriebene Welle (13) mit dem antriebsseitigen Rotor (12) gelenkig verbunden. Darüber hinaus ist die Achse des antriebsseitigen Rotors (12) über Fixierelemente (8), welche mit dem Gehäuse (21) verbindbar sind, radial fixierbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 15/00; F04C 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/18 (2006.01); F04C 15/00 (2006.01); F16D 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 15/0061 (2013.01); F04C 15/0069 (2013.01); F04C 2/18 (2013.01); F04C 2240/60 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979945 A2 20000216; EP 0979945 A3 20000531; EP 0979945 B1 20050615; EP 0979945 B8 20050810; DE 59912176 D1 20050721; JP 2001187926 A 20010710; US 6518684 B1 20030211

INPADOC legal status

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060316

2005-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912176

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-07-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MAAG PUMP SYSTEMS TEXTRON AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2005-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040210

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE LI

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: MAGNETIC COUPLING SYSTEM AND USE OF IT FOR A GEAR PUMP

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI