Global Patent Index - EP 0979949 A1

EP 0979949 A1 2000-02-16 - Fan blade assembly of a ceiling fan

Title (en)

Fan blade assembly of a ceiling fan

Title (de)

Blattanordnung eines Deckenlüfters

Title (fr)

Assemblage de pales d' un ventilateur plafonnier

Publication

EP 0979949 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98306362 A

Priority

  • EP 98306362 A
  • CA 2274153 A

Abstract (en)

A fan blade assembly is to be secured to a rotor of a ceiling fan, and includes a mounting member (35,35',35'') of a single-piece construction with an annular mounting plate (351) to be secured on the rotor, and a plurality of mounting arms (353), each of which extends radially and outwardly from the annular mounting plate (351) to form a free mounting end (355,355'355''). A plurality of blade members (37,37') are mounted fixedly on the free mounting ends (355,355',355'') by a plurality of fasteners (36,36',39), such as screws. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/34; F04D 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/08 (2006.01); F04D 29/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/088 (2013.01); F04D 29/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979949 A1 20000216; CA 2274153 A1 20001210

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030516

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021105

2001-04-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI