Global Patent Index - EP 0979950 A1

EP 0979950 A1 2000-02-16 - Centrifugal pump with check-valve

Title (en)

Centrifugal pump with check-valve

Title (de)

Kreiselpumpe mit Rückschlagventil

Title (fr)

Pompe centrifuge avec clapet de non-retour

Publication

EP 0979950 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112425 A

Priority

DE 19836625 A

Abstract (en)

The centrifugal pump has an induction connection (6) and a pressure connection (8) for joining to the connection flange (13) of a pipeline. One of the connectors has a receiver (15) for the insertion of an adapter (14) projecting over the edge (32) of the receiver. The adapter is sealed against the receiver on one side and against the connecting flange by its facing base surface.

Abstract (de)

Pumpe, insbesondere Kreiselpumpe 1, mit einem Saug- 6 und einem Druckstutzen 8, die jeweils an einen Anschlußflansch 13 einer Rohrleitung anschließbar sind, wobei einer der Stutzen eine Aufnahme 15 zum Einsetzen eines über den Rand 32 der Aufnahme 15 hinausragenden Adapters 14 aufweist, wobei der Adapter 14 einerseits gegen die Aufnahme 15 und andererseits mit einer zum Anschlußflansch 13 gewandte Grundfläche 20 gegen den Anschlußflansch 13 abdichtet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/40; F04D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/0083 (2013.01); F04D 29/406 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979950 A1 20000216; EP 0979950 B1 20030820; DE 19836625 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906651

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140609

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140625

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140612

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140625

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031110

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906651 P 20030925

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILO AG

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000205

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI