Global Patent Index - EP 0979952 A2

EP 0979952 A2 2000-02-16 - Rotary actuator, especially pneumatic rotary actuator

Title (en)

Rotary actuator, especially pneumatic rotary actuator

Title (de)

Drehantrieb, insbesondere pneumatischer Drehantieb

Title (fr)

Vérin rotatif, surtout vérin rotatif pneumatique

Publication

EP 0979952 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112430 A

Priority

DE 29814551 U

Abstract (en)

The rotary drive has a pneumatic piston (5) axially guided on several guide pins (4) and with a central threaded bore (9). The drive shaft (6) is axially fixed and has an extension threaded into the central bore of the piston. As the piston moves it causes the shaft to rotate. The cover (2) of the pneumatic cylinder is removable for repairs. The cover and its mounting in the cylinder housing, have corresponding grooves to take a circular split ring (13) which holds the cover in place. A pin (20) in one side of the piston runs in a groove in the cylinder and limits the axial movement of the piston in either direction.

Abstract (de)

Drehantrieb (1), insbesondere pneumatischer Drehantrieb, mit einem durch einen Gehäusedeckel (2) verschlossenen Gehäuse (3), und einem innerhalb des Gehäuses (3) gegen die Wirkung ein oder mehrerer Federelemente (4) verschieblich gelagerten Kolben (5), mit einer im Gehäusedeckel (2) drehbar gelagerten Welle (6), die zumindest innerhalb des Gehäuses (3) als Spindelwelle (7) mit einem Außengewinde (8) ausgebildet ist, wobei die Spindelwelle (7) in eine in dem Kolben (5) angeordnete Spindelmutter (9) eingreift. Es soll ein Drehantrieb (1) geschaffen werden, der einfach und funktionsgerecht aufgebaut ist, und in wartungstechnischer Hinsicht allen Anforderungen genügt. Hierzu wird vorgeschlagen, daß der Gehäusedeckel (2) an dem Gehäuse (3) lösbar fixiert ist und mit dem Kolben (5) in Federspannung haltender Verbindung steht. Folglich sind Gehäuse (3) und Gehäusedeckel (2) nicht mehr miteinander verschweißt, vielmehr läßt sich der Gehäusedeckel (2) im Zuge der Wartung vom Gehäuse (3) trennen. Damit wird der Gehäuseinnenraum frei zugänglich und der Drehantrieb (1) kann vollständig oder nahezu vollständig zerlegt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/08 (2006.01); F15B 15/14 (2006.01); F15B 15/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/068 (2013.01); F15B 15/1438 (2013.01); F15B 15/1476 (2013.01); F15B 15/2807 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29814551 U1 19981112; CN 1245269 A 20000223; EP 0979952 A2 20000216; EP 0979952 A3 20000322

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030808

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030328

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FR GB IT

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990709

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI