Global patent index - EP 0979971 A1

EP 0979971 A1 2000-02-16 - Lamp housing comprising a pressure relief device

Title (en)

Lamp housing comprising a pressure relief device

Title (de)

Leuchtengehäuse mit einer Einrichtung zum Druckausgleich

Title (fr)

Boîtier pour luminaire avec un dispositif d'équilibrage de la pression

Publication

EP 0979971 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114946 A

Priority

EP 98114946 A

Abstract (en)

The pressure equalization channel (17, 19) has an air-permeable membrane (21) closing it, which prevents entry of dust and water.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Leuchtengehäuse (1), welches im wesentlichen luftdicht verschließbar ist, mit einem Druckausgleichskanal (17,19), welcher das Innere des Leuchtengehäuses mit der Außenseite des Leuchtengehäuses verbindet, welches dadurch gekennzeichnet ist, daß der Kanal mit einer luftdurchlässigen Membrane (21) verschlossen ist, welche ein Hindurchtreten von Staub und Wasser zumindest begrenzt verhindert. Die Erfindung betrifft weiterhin eine Leuchte mit einem derartigen Leuchtengehäuse. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); F21V 31/00 (2006.01); F21V 31/03 (2006.01); F21V 21/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 31/03 (2013.01); F21V 15/01 (2013.01); F21V 31/00 (2013.01); F21V 21/30 (2013.01); F21W 2131/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979971 A1 20000216; EP 0979971 B1 20070117; AT 352012 T 20070215; DE 59813883 D1 20070308

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-12-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC

- Ref Document Number: 352012

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20121019

2012-10-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20121004 AND 20121010

2012-04-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2012-04-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SITECO BETEILIGUNGSVERWALTUNGS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2011-12-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SITECO BELEUCHTUNGSTECHNIK GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59813883

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-12-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59813883

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE

- Effective date: 20111109

2011-11-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59813883

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT, DE

2007-12-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071018

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2007-07-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2007-04-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070417

2007-03-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070215

2007-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59813883

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-03-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2007-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2007-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2007-01-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070117

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040813

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI