Global Patent Index - EP 0979973 A1

EP 0979973 A1 2000-02-16 - Wall duct with a collar counteracting recirculation

Title (en)

Wall duct with a collar counteracting recirculation

Title (de)

Mauerdurchführung mit Rand zur Verhinderung der Rezirkulation

Title (fr)

Traversée de mur avec collier empêchant la recirculation

Publication

EP 0979973 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202542 A

Priority

NL 1009852 A

Abstract (en)

A wall duct (1) with a supply pipe (3) for air and a discharge pipe (2) for flue gases situated inside the supply pipe (3) has a discharge aperture (4) formed by one end of the discharge pipe (2) and supply apertures (6) provided in the periphery of the supply pipe (3). A collar (8) is fitted in order to prevent waste gases from flowing back from the discharge aperture (4) to the supply apertures (6). According to the invention, in order to avoid a too great air resistance, said collar (8) does not extend beyond the discharge aperture (4). The collar (8) is preferably provided with an opening (9), which is situated at a distance from the supply apertures (6). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23L 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23L 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23L 17/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979973 A1 20000216; EP 0979973 B1 20040121; DE 69914265 D1 20040226; NL 1009852 C2 20000215

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-06 [REG FR ERR] CORRECTION

- Free text: BOPI DE PUBLICATION Nø: 05/03 PAGES: 237 PARTIE DU BULLETIN CONCERNEE: BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N'A PAS ETE REMISE A I'INPI IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE.

2005-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040802

2005-01-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-01-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-08-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-04-22 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040422

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914265 P 20040226

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-01-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI