Global patent index - EP 0979979 A2

EP 0979979 A2 2000-02-16 - Portable air conditioner

Title (en)

Portable air conditioner

Title (de)

Transportable Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Appareil de climatisation transportable

Publication

EP 0979979 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114953 A

Priority

ES 9801752 A

Abstract (en)

The air conditioning plant has a casing containing an evaporator and a condenser with a distribution unit (10). The outflow sector includes a setting device (5) inside the distribution unit. It includes a sector of the casing fixed to the distribution unit and a setting element which can be turned and is sealed. It serves as at least part of the outflow sector and has an outflow outlet (6).

Abstract (de)

Eine transportable Klimaanlage mit einem Gehäuse, in dem ein Verdampfer (1) und ein Kondensator (2) vorgesehen sind, der zwecks seiner Kühlung durch eine Verteilungseinheit (10), die mit Abflußöffnungen (18) versehen ist, mit Kondenswasser berieselt wird, das vom Verdampfer (1) tropft und das sich in einem Behälter (4) ansammelt, von dem es zu einem Abflußabschnitt fließen kann, von dem aus das Wasser nach außerhalb des Gehäuses abgelassen werden kann, wobei das Kondenswasser mittels einer Pumpe (8) durch eine Verbindungsleitung (9) zum Abflußabschnitt befördert wird, wobei der Abflußabschnitt ein Einstellmittel (5) umfaßt, das imstande ist, die Kondenswasserströmung zur Verteilungseinheit (10) zu verhindern. Das Einstellmittel (5) ist in der Verteilungseinheit (10) angeordnet und umfaßt einen Abschnitt des Gehäuses, der fest auf der Verteilungseinheit (10) angebracht ist sowie ein Einstellelement (12), das drehbar geführt und flüssigkeitsdicht ist und zumindest vorwiegend als Abflußabschnitt dient und das einen Abflußausgang (6) aufweist. Das Einstellmittel (5) ist an seinem zweiten Ende (14) herabgesetzt sein und weist einen Rohrabschnitt (15) auf, der einen radialen Abstand von einer Rohrummantelung aufweist, in der Bedienelemente (16) zur Drehung des Einstellmittels (5) vorgesehen sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/02 (2011.01); F24F 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/222 (2013.01); F24F 1/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979979 A2 20000216; EP 0979979 A3 20011031; EP 0979979 B1 20040623; DE 59909793 D1 20040729; ES 2160015 A1 20011016; ES 2160015 B1 20020501

INPADOC legal status

2014-07-10 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Ref Document Number: 59909793

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: F24F0001020000

- IPC: F24F0013220000

- Effective date: 20140521

2014-07-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59909793

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130730

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-05-21 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Ref Document Number: 59909793

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: F24F0001020000

- IPC: F24F0013220000

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130730

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130730

2014-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59909793

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120731

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120803

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040806

2004-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909793

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-06-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020502

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 24F 1/02 A, 7F 24F 13/22 B, 7F 24F 1/04 B

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ARRAIZA, JAIME

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GONZALES, JUAN

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BARCOS, JESUS

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHMUELLING, RALF

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI