Global Patent Index - EP 0979980 A1

EP 0979980 A1 2000-02-16 - Heat exchanger

Title (en)

Heat exchanger

Title (de)

Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur

Publication

EP 0979980 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99390016 A

Priority

FR 9810376 A

Abstract (en)

The heat exchanger consists of a series of horizontal radiant tubes (1) connected to vertical manifolds (2, 3) attached to water feed and return pipes (5, 7). One of the two manifolds is made from two linked tubular ducts (8, 9) joined at the top by a connecting piece (10). The second duct (9) of the two is connected to the horizontal tubes and is closed at its lower end, while the first is connected via a sleeve (13) and a flexible connector (14, 16) to one of the feed and return pipes. The other manifold has a duct connected via a sleeve at its lower end to the other feed or return pipe.

Abstract (fr)

L'échangeur de chaleur du type radiateur pour installation de chauffage central comprend plusieurs éléments tubulaires radiants horizontaux (1) connectés à un collecteur vertical (2) d'alimentation en eau et à un collecteur vertical (3) de récupération d'eau. L'un des collecteurs (2) (3) est constitué d'un premier conduit tubulaire (8) et d'un second conduit tubulaire (9) connectés hydrauliquement l'un à l'autre en partie supérieure par un raccord (10). Le second conduit (9) est connecté aux éléments radiants (1) et est obturé en partie inférieure et le premier est relié depuis un embout de raccordement (13) à l'un des deux piquages (4), (6) par l'intermédiaire d'un flexible (14), (16) avec raccord terminal (15), (17). L'autre collecteur est constitué d'au moins un conduit tubulaire relié hydrauliquement depuis un embout de raccordement (13) en relation hydraulique avec son extrémité inférieure, à l'autre piquage par l'intermédiaire d'un second flexible avec raccord terminal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 9/12; F28D 1/053; F28F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/12 (2006.01); F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 1/22 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/02 (2013.01); F24D 19/0002 (2013.01); F24D 19/0063 (2013.01); F24D 19/0073 (2013.01); F28D 1/0535 (2013.01); F28F 1/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979980 A1 20000216; FR 2782379 A1 20000218; FR 2782379 B1 20001013

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030909

2002-10-30 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: ZEHNDER GROUP CARMAUX S.A.

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020322

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI