Global Patent Index - EP 0979985 A2

EP 0979985 A2 2000-02-16 - Apparatus for the heat treatment of a web

Title (en)

Apparatus for the heat treatment of a web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Wärmebehandlung einer Warenbahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le traitement thermique d'une bande de matière

Publication

EP 0979985 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115983 A

Priority

DE 19836834 A

Abstract (en)

The cylindrical jet has a jet opening at one end, and a funnel shaped entry at the other end, which transits into the jet box base. Equipment used to apply heat to piece goods (2) has jet boxes (29, 30) above and below the plane (9) of fabric travel. The jets, at the facing sides of the jet boxes (29, 30) are cylindrical jet units aligned at an angle to the base of each jet assembly. The cylindrical jet has a jet opening at one end, and a funnel shaped entry at the other end, which transits into the jet box base. The jet box base is flat, with the jets located in recesses in the base. Preferred Features: All the jet are aligned at an angle to the jet unit base. The jets of the upper and lower jet boxes (29, 30) are aligned against each other so that the fabric (2), moving along the center plane (9), is given an alternating bowed movement upwards and downwards, and across the fabric width. Each unit has four jets aligned at each other. The jets to the left and right of the longitudinal center line are aligned inwards to the center, above and below the fabric (2). The jets aligned across the direction of fabric travel alternate towards and away from each other with, in each case, paired jets in the same direction. The lateral jets spread the fabric in corrugations. The upper and lower jets are in alignment with each other, or they are offset from each other. The lateral jets are in rows, where the jets in adjacent rows in the movement direction are offset from those in the preceding row. Covers are fitted to match the width of the jet box working surfaces to the width of the fabric (2), as slides within the jet boxes. The jet openings can be flush with the flat surfaces of the jet box bases.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zur Wärmebehandlung einer Warenbahn (2) mit oberhalb und unterhalb einer mittleren Warenbahntransportebene (9) angeordneten Düsenkästen (20,30), wobei jeder Düsenkasten einen der Warenbahn zugewandten Düsenboden (21) mit einer Vielzahl von Düsen (22,22') aufweist. Die Düsen weisen einen zylindrischen Teil (21a) auf, der schräg zum Düsenboden ausgerichtet ist und an seinem einen Ende einen Düsenmund (21b) aufweist, während sich an seinem anderen Ende ein trichterförmig erweiternder Bereich (22c) anschließt, der in den Düsenboden (21) übergeht. Die Düsen (22,22') sind in Vertiefungen (21a) des ebenen Düsenbodens (21) ausgebildet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 13/10; F26B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/10 (2006.01); F26B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 21/004 (2013.01); F26B 13/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979985 A2 20000216; EP 0979985 A3 20010314; EP 0979985 B1 20020206; AT 213061 T 20020215; DE 19836834 A1 20000302; ES 2168826 T3 20020616; PT 979985 E 20020731

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120814

2013-10-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120813

2013-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130213

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 213061 T

- Effective date: 20120813

2013-02-21 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20130213

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110812

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110901

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20110810

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110812

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-03-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030301

2003-02-28 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BRUCKNER TROCKENTECHNIK G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20020831

2003-01-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-10-02 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-13 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-08-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168826 T3

2002-05-06 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020506

2002-05-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020506

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900818 20020321

2002-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-02-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-02-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-02-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-02-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-02-06 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020206

2002-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 213061 T 20020215

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS FOR THE HEAT TREATMENT OF A TEXTILE WEB

2001-10-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS FOR THE HEAT TREATMENT OF A TEXTILE WEB

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010625

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010514

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI