Global Patent Index - EP 0980084 A1

EP 0980084 A1 2000-02-16 - Electric combination switch

Title (en)

Electric combination switch

Title (de)

Elektrische Schalterkombination

Title (fr)

Ensemble de commutateurs électriques

Publication

EP 0980084 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114500 A

Priority

DE 19836298 A

Abstract (en)

The switch combination has an electric rocker switch which can be pivoted from a middle position to two switch positions and which automatically returns to its middle position. It also includes an electric slider switch which can take up two switch positions. The slider switch actuator (3) is in opposing dependence on that (1) of the rocker switch. The actuator of the slider switch in at least one of its switch positions mechanically blocks the actuator of the rocker switch in its middle position.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine elektrische Schalterkombination, insbesondere zur Steuerung eines Tempomats eines Motorrads, beschrieben, mit einem ersten Schalter, einem elektrischen Kippschalter, der aus einer Mittelstellung in zwei Kippstellungen verschwenkt werden kann und sich selbsttätig wieder in die Mittelstellung zurückstellt. Ein weiterer elektrischer Schalter, ein Schiebeschalter, der mindestens zwei verschiedene Schaltstellungen einnehmen kann, steht mit dem ersten Schalter so in gegenseitiger Abhängigkeit, daß dessen Betätigungsorgan das Betätigungsorgan des Kippschalters in wenigstens einer Schallstellung in seiner Mittelstellung mechanisch blockiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980084 A1 20000216; EP 0980084 B1 20040331; DE 19836298 A1 20000217; US 6111209 A 20000829

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909003 P 20040506

2004-04-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991203

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI