Global patent index - EP 0980086 A1

EP 0980086 A1 2000-02-16 - Device for protecting a switchgear assembly against thermal overloading

Title (en)

Device for protecting a switchgear assembly against thermal overloading

Title (de)

Schutzeinrichtung gegen die thermische Überlastung einer Schaltanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour protéger une installation de commutation contre une surcharge thermique

Publication

EP 0980086 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112165 A

Priority

DE 19836270 A

Abstract (en)

The protective or safety mechanism protects against thermal overload of the fuse chamber (1) of a switch system with a downstream transformer (15). A high voltage, high power fuse (11) is arranged in the fuse chamber, with a trigger (16-18) for switching a transformer switch (10). The high voltage fuse (11) is provided with a trigger such that at the latest when a permissible power consumption value of the fuse chamber is exceeded, it opens the transformer switch (10) by means of its release voltage.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Schutzeinrichtung gegen die thermische Überlastung der Sicherungskammer (1) einer Schaltanlage (23) mit nachgeschaltetem Transformator, beispielsweise zur Versorgung eines Niederspannungsfeldes, wobei in der Sicherungskammer (1) eine Hochspannungs-Hochleistungs-Sicherung (11) mit einer Auslöseeinrichtung (16) zum Schalten eines Transformatorschalters (10) mit Freiauslösung angeordnet ist. Um mit Hilfe einer solchen Schutzeinrichtung eine Abschaltung des Transformators auch bei erheblich kleineren Strömen als bisher zu ermöglichen, vorzugsweise unterhalb des Nennstromes der HH-Sicherung, insbesondere wenn letztere defekt ist, wird erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, daß die HH-Sicherung (11) mit der Auslöseeinrichtung (16) so gestaltet ist, daß letztere spätestens bei Überschreiten eines zulässigen Leistungsaufnahmewertes der Sicherungskammer (1) über ihre Auslösespannung den Transformatorschalter (10) öffnet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/12; H01H 85/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/12 (2006.01); H01H 85/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/46 (2013.01); H01H 71/122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980086 A1 20000216; EP 0980086 B1 20070822; AT 371257 T 20070915; DE 19836270 A1 20000217; DE 19836270 B4 20101125; ES 2291006 T3 20080216

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080418

2011-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080624

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: EFEN G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080526

2008-04-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2008-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2291006

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE ES FR IT

2007-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: LV SI

2005-04-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BASSEI, HERBERT, DR.-ING.

2005-04-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KLEMME, THOMAS

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EFEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE ES FR IT

2000-10-25 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: LV PAYMENT 20000713;SI PAYMENT 20000713

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE ES FR IT

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI