Global patent index - EP 0980111 A1

EP 0980111 A1 2000-02-16 - Antenna device of a base station of a mobile telecommunication network.

Title (en)

Antenna device of a base station of a mobile telecommunication network.

Title (de)

Antennenvorrichtung einer Basisstation für ein mobiles Kommunikationsnetz

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'antenne pour station fixe d'un réseau de télécommunication mobile

Publication

EP 0980111 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98201691 A

Priority

EP 98201691 A

Abstract (en)

An antenna device for a base station of a mobile telecommunication network, comprising at least two linear phased-array antennas, with the longitudinal direction of each phased-array antenna being directed at least substantially vertically, the at least three phased-array antennas being jointly accommodated in a tubular housing, with the longitudinal direction of the housing being directed at least substantially vertically. Because the phased-array antennas are jointly accommodated in a single tubular housing, the visual appearance of the antenna is experienced as particularly attractive. The antenna has the appearance of a mast and is therefore hardly noticeable. The housing functions as a radome. An additional advantage of the housing is that the phased-array antennas are protected from weather influences. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/12 (2006.01); H01Q 1/42 (2006.01); H01Q 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/42 (2013.01); H01Q 1/1242 (2013.01); H01Q 21/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980111 A1 20000216

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030622

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021210

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LIBERTEL NETWERK B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI