Global Patent Index - EP 0980118 A3

EP 0980118 A3 2001-02-21 - Cable shield terminator

Title (en)

Cable shield terminator

Title (de)

Kabelabschirmungsanschluss

Title (fr)

Terminaison d'écran de câble

Publication

EP 0980118 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99306358 A

Priority

GB 9817591 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0980118A2] A terminator (8) for terminating the shield of each of a plurality of shielded cables, comprising an electrically conductive body (10) with a plurality of through holes (12), each for receiving one of the shielded cables, and terminating means (14) insertable between the shield and the insulator(s) of the conductor(s) of the cables to effect wedging in the holes thereby to make electrical contact between the shield and the body. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/658; H01R 9/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/658 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/6589 (2013.01); H01R 13/6592 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980118 A2 20000216; EP 0980118 A3 20010221; GB 2340671 A 20000223; GB 2340671 B 20001011; GB 9817591 D0 19981007

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010822

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/658 A, 7H 01R 9/03 B

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI