Global Patent Index - EP 0980183 A1

EP 0980183 A1 2000-02-16 - Electron emission light-emitting device and display apparatus using the same

Title (en)

Electron emission light-emitting device and display apparatus using the same

Title (de)

Lichtemittierende Elektronenemissionsvorrichtung und diese verwendende Anzeigevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif à émission d'électrons,émetteur de lumière et appareil d'affichage l'utilisant

Publication

EP 0980183 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99115121 A

Priority

JP 22583698 A

Abstract (en)

An electron emission light-emitting device comprises an electron emission device and a fluorescent material layer (3) formed on the thin-film metal (15). The electron emission device comprises an electron-supply layer (12) made of semiconductor formed on an ohmic electrode (11); an insulator layer (13) formed on the electron-supply layer; and a thin-film metal electrode (15) formed on the insulator layer. The electron emission light-emitting device emits light when an electric field is applied between the electron-supply layer and the thin-film metal. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/04 (2006.01); H01J 1/312 (2006.01); H01J 1/62 (2006.01); H01J 29/18 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01); H01J 63/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B82Y 10/00 (2013.01); H01J 1/312 (2013.01); H01J 31/127 (2013.01); H01J 63/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0980183 A1 20000216; JP 2000057935 A 20000225; US 6472803 B1 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050430

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041019

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI