Global Patent Index - EP 0980193 A1

EP 0980193 A1 2000-02-16 - Heating layer element

Title (en)

Heating layer element

Title (de)

Beheizbares Flächenelement

Title (fr)

Elément de chauffage plat

Publication

EP 0980193 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115384 A

Priority

DE 19835378 A

Abstract (en)

A heatable surface element, consisting of fiber-reinforced silicon carbide, is new. Preferred Features: The reinforcing fibers are carbon or glass fibers. The element forms a standing surface for cooking or frying vessels above a radiant heater or has a heating conductor (5) of fiber-reinforced silicon carbide fitted in bottom face recesses (4) and separated from the element by a layer (6) of boron nitride or ceramic adhesive.

Abstract (de)

Ein beheizbares Flächenelement, insbesondere als Koch-, Brat- oder Backfläche, soll bei guter Wärmeleitfähigkeit eine hohe Temperaturwechselbeständigkeit aufweisen. Hierfür besteht das Flächenelement 1 aus faserverstärktem Siliziumkarbid. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/36; C04B 35/56; F24C 7/02; H05B 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/14 (2006.01); H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/148 (2013.01); H05B 3/145 (2013.01); H05B 3/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 305 (M - 849) 13 July 1989 (1989-07-13)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 027 (C - 0797) 22 January 1991 (1991-01-22)
  • [XA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 288 (E - 1092) 22 July 1991 (1991-07-22)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19835378 A1 20000210; EP 0980193 A1 20000216

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020523

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000814

2000-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL AKO STIFTUNG & CO. KG

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI