Global Patent Index - EP 0980194 A2

EP 0980194 A2 2000-02-16 - Fixation device for radiations heating bodies in a glass-ceramic plate

Title (en)

Fixation device for radiations heating bodies in a glass-ceramic plate

Title (de)

Halteanordnung für Strahlungsheizkörper bei einem Glaskeramik-Kochfeld

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation de corps irradiant des rayonnements chez une plaque vitro-céramique

Publication

EP 0980194 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113955 A

Priority

DE 19835971 A

Abstract (en)

Radiant elements (3) consist of a carrier tray (4) with an insulator and heat conductor (6) in it. The carrier tray, fixed in place in a trough (7) opposite the respective cooking spot, springs against the underside of the glass-ceramics cool top platform (2).

Abstract (de)

Halteanordnung für Strahlungs-Heizkörper (3) bei einem Glaskeramik-Kochfeld (2) mit mehreren Kochstellen, wobei die Strahlungsheizkörper (3) aus einer Trägerschale (4) mit Isolierkörper (5) und darin eingelegtem Heizleiter (6) bestehen und die Trägerschale (4) gegenüber der betreffenden Kochstelle in einer Muldenwanne (7) örtlich festgelegt und federnd gegen die Unterseite des Glaskeramik-Kochfeldes (2) gepreßt ist. Zum Festlegen der Trägerschale (4) in der Muldenwanne (7) und zum Anpressen an die Unterseite des Glaskeramik-Kochfeldes (2) sind mindestens zwei Doppel-Federelemente (8) vorgesehen, die einerseits in Eingriff mit der Trägerschale (4) bringbar und andererseits am Boden der Muldenwanne (7) einhängbar oder dort verrastbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 3/74; H05B 3/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/74 (2013.01); F24C 7/067 (2013.01); H05B 3/748 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29610465 U1 19971009 - AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19835971 A1 20000210; DE 19835971 C2 20011018; DE 59912545 D1 20051020; EP 0980194 A2 20000216; EP 0980194 A3 20020102; EP 0980194 B1 20050914; ES 2246077 T3 20060201

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080718

2009-09-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080718

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080717

2009-05-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070721

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070726

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-07-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070724

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2246077 T3

2005-10-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912545 P 20051020

2005-09-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2002-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 3/74 A, 7H 05B 3/68 B, 7F 24C 15/10 B

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI