Global Patent Index - EP 0980223 A1

EP 0980223 A1 2000-02-23 - CORDLESS REMOTE CONTROL DEVICE FOR A VACUUM CLEANER

Title (en)

CORDLESS REMOTE CONTROL DEVICE FOR A VACUUM CLEANER

Title (de)

DRAHTLOSE FERNBETÄTIGUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN STAUBSAUGER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TELECOMMANDE SANS FIL POUR ASPIRATEUR

Publication

EP 0980223 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98946411 A

Priority

  • DE 19736595 A
  • EP 9805343 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19736595A1] The device has detachable a mounting for transmitter on the cleaner's handle or suction pipe, with two tangential arms to outer contour of handle or pipe. The device has a transmitter device (1) provided with control buttons (3) mounted on the handle (7) of a suction hose joined to a vacuum cleaner or on a suction pipe coupled to the hose. Control signals from the apparatus act upon the control circuit of the fan motor of the cleaner through a receiver located in or on the cleaner casing. The transmitter device is detachably located on the handle or suction pipe. Two retaining arms (5) are provided on the casing of the transmitter device. The arms can be plugged on tangentially to the outer contour of the handle or suction pipe.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/2894 (2013.01); A47L 9/2842 (2013.01); A47L 9/2857 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909875A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19736595 A1 19990225; DE 19736595 B4 20070412; EP 0980223 A1 20000223; EP 0980223 B1 20041117; TR 9900888 T1 19991021; WO 9909875 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59812276

- Effective date: 20150402

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120821

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120821

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120822

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120821

2013-04-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110825

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110829

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812276 P 20041223

2004-12-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2002-12-18 [D18R] REFUSED (DELETED)

2002-11-13 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020623

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990521

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE