Global Patent Index - EP 0980292 A1

EP 0980292 A1 2000-02-23 - DEVICE FOR GENERATING DIRECTED VIBRATIONS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR GENERATING DIRECTED VIBRATIONS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN GERICHTETER SCHWINGUNGEN

Title (fr)

GENERATEUR DE VIBRATIONS ORIENTEES

Publication

EP 0980292 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925536 A

Priority

  • DE 29708118 U
  • DE 19741413 A
  • EP 9802647 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6263750B1] A device for generating directed vibrations has two centrifugal weights which are independently driven at the same speed of rotation but in opposite directions. The centrifugal weights are supported on a largely stiff carrier secured by a holder to a bracket. The holder allows the carrier to move relative to the bracket. When the centrifugal weights start moving, they become synchronized within a short period of time and generate vibrations which can be used in the desired manner via the bracket.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B06B 1/16; B06B 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/14 (2006.01); B06B 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/14 (2013.01); B06B 1/166 (2013.01); Y10T 74/18344 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850171A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6263750 B1 20010724; EP 0980292 A1 20000223; EP 0980292 B1 20021030; JP 2001524023 A 20011127; JP 3919827 B2 20070530; WO 9850171 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130505

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806120

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130506

2014-01-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WACKER NEUSON SE, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59806120

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806120

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59806120

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-08-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-04-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021030

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-02-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

2002-12-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806120 20021205

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-10-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021030

2002-07-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MAURER, THOMAS

2002-07-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KRAMP, EDITH

2002-07-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BREITENBACH, JOHANN

2002-07-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BROMBERGER, THOMAS

2002-07-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARK, ALEXANDER

2002-07-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SICK, GEORG

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991013

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE