Global Patent Index - EP 0980295 A1

EP 0980295 A1 2000-02-23 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SLABS OF STEEL

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING SLABS OF STEEL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN VON BRAMMEN AUS STAHL

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE BRAMES D'ACIER

Publication

EP 0980295 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98932038 A

Priority

  • DE 9801198 W
  • DE 19720768 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850185A1] The present invention pertains to a method for producing slabs of steel, whereby the rod leaves an ingot mould together with the liquid fusion contained therein, while, in a casting guide installed downstream from said ingot mould, the jaw aperture of the scaffold-type guide rolls is progressively adjusted by means of elements connecting the lower and the upper frames. The inventive method comprises the following steps: a) changing the jaw aperture by swaying the device around a centerline (c) in such a way that the dynamic effects on the guide rolls are insignificant; b) adjusting the sway amplitude (A) of the jaw aperture to such a value that no plastic deformation of the ingolt mould can result therefrom; c) determining the actual jaw aperture (s); d) determining at the same time the actuating power (F) of said adjusting elements, as well as the amplitude (A) of said actuating power; and e) in the event of an increased actuating power amplitude (A), adjusting the jaw aperture (s) based on a measure which is set and/or guided by pressure control on at least one adjusting element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/20; B22D 11/12; B22D 11/128

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/12 (2006.01); B22D 11/128 (2006.01); B22D 11/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/1206 (2013.01); B22D 11/128 (2013.01); B22D 11/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850185A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850185 A1 19981112; AT 206973 T 20011115; AU 8209098 A 19981127; BR 9809604 A 20001003; DE 19720768 C1 19990114; EP 0980295 A1 20000223; EP 0980295 B1 20011017; ID 20520 A 19990107; TW 404869 B 20000911; US 2003145976 A1 20030807; US 6701999 B2 20040309

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59801786

2015-09-28 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59801786

- Representative's name: ANWALTSKANZLEI MEISSNER & MEISSNER, DE

2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-04-27 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030427

2002-10-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020416

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-04-04 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020404

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-03-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801786 20011122

2001-11-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT LU NL

2001-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 206973 T 20011115

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-04-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991008

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT LU NL