Global Patent Index - EP 0980311 A1

EP 0980311 A1 2000-02-23 - INKING SYSTEM FOR INKING A FORM CYLINDER OF A PRINTING MACHINE BY INTAGLIO ENGRAVING

Title (en)

INKING SYSTEM FOR INKING A FORM CYLINDER OF A PRINTING MACHINE BY INTAGLIO ENGRAVING

Title (de)

FARBWERK ZUM EINFÄRBEN EINES FORMZYLINDERS EINER TIEFDRUCKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ENCRAGE POUR L'ENCRAGE D'UN CYLINDRE GRAVE D'UNE PRESSE DE ROTOGRAVURE

Publication

EP 0980311 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98932044 A

Priority

  • DE 9801212 W
  • DE 19718587 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850233A1] In an inking system for a printing machine by intaglio engraving, the ink pan (06), the collector pan (07) and the wiping blade device (03) are jointly height-adjustable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 9/16 (2006.01); B41F 9/02 (2006.01); B41F 9/18 (2006.01); B41F 13/20 (2006.01); B41F 23/04 (2006.01); B41F 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 9/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850233A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850233 A1 19981112; EP 0980310 A1 20000223; EP 0980310 B1 20010725; EP 0980311 A1 20000223; EP 0980311 B1 20011107; EP 0980312 A1 20000223; EP 0980312 B1 20020731; JP 2000510401 A 20000815; JP 2000510402 A 20000815; JP 2000512931 A 20001003; JP 3207442 B2 20010910; JP 3236305 B2 20011210; US 6209454 B1 20010403; US 6230620 B1 20010515; US 6283023 B1 20010904; WO 9850232 A1 19981112; WO 9850235 A2 19981112; WO 9850235 A3 19990514; WO 9850235 B1 20010412

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070502

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2005-05-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050523

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050425

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020114

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802069 20011213

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHRISTMANN, DIETER

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DRUMM, HANS-DIETER

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERB, RUDOLF

2001-10-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STRAUBINGER, WERNER, GEORG, ROMAN

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010403

2000-02-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991203

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI